CA SB1217 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 791, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 7542, 7564, and 7570 of, and to add Sections 7542.2, 7542.3, 7542.4, 7542.5, 7542.6, 7542.7, 7542.9, 7542.10, 7542.11, and 7542.12 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private Investigator Act: firearms qualification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1217 Morrell Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1217 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1217 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 791, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-24SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5427.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6312.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4359.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4783.) (April 23).
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7525Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7542Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7542.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7542.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7542.12New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7542.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7542.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7542.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7542.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7542.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7542.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7542.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7542.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7564Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7570Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback