CA SB1212 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - April 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - April 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 745) to Title 2 of Part 1 of Division 2 of the Civil Code, relating to real property.
Title
Real estate investment trusts: purchase, acquisition, and sale of housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 745 | New Code | See Bill Text |