CA SB1207 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1418.22 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Skilled nursing facilities: backup power system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1207 Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-06-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3534.) (May 13).
2020-05-11SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1418.22New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback