CA SB1203 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 32282, 47605, and 47605.6 of, and to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 32090) to Chapter 1 of Part 19 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, the Education Code, relating to school safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School safety: lockdown training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1203 Bates (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4423.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4306.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-02SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4810.) (April 25).
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-04SenateApril 4 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-13SenateMarch 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-05SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code32090New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code32282Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47605Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47605.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48310Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback