CA SB12 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - June 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - June 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65007, 65302, 65584, 65584.04, and 65584.06 of, and to add Sections 65011, 65012, 65013, 65040.18, 65302.11, 65860.2, 65865.6, 65962.3, and 66474.03 to, the Government Code, to amend Section 13132.7 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 4290 of, and to add Section 4123.6 to, the Public Resources Code, and to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 550) to Division 1 of the Water Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: planning and zoning: wildfires.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] |
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-12 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB12 McGuire et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB12 McGuire et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Assembly | June 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | July 12 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) Reconsideration granted. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1310.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1178.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 986.) (April 29). |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 632.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referral to Com. on N.R. & W. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HOUSING, and N.R. & W. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65011 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65012 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65013 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65040.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65302.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65584 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65584.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65584.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65860.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65865.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65962.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66474.03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13132.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4123.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 4290 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 550 | New Code | See Bill Text |