CA SB12 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 727, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 727, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 35110 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: aerodynamic devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB12 Corbett (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Assembly - SB 12 Corbett Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-07-05 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB12 Corbett (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Assembly - SB 12 Corbett Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-07-05 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB12 Corbett (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 727, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-31 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5080.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-30 | Set for hearing August 30. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5043.) | |
2012-08-29 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4923.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-08-28 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6355.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time and amended. (Page 6171.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 20). | |
2012-08-13 | Read third time and amended. (Page 5900.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2012-08-08 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 5). | |
2012-07-05 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5594.) Set, second hearing. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-07-02 | Set, first hearing. Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. suspense file. Failed passage in committee. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-06-19 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-05-03 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and REV. & TAX. | |
2012-01-19 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-01-19 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2678.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-01-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-10 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2623.) (January 10). | |
2012-01-06 | Set for hearing January 10. | |
2012-01-05 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-01-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22903 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22903.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22905 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22906 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22924 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 24044.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 24045.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 485.010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Commercial Code | 2403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Commercial Code | 6101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 2953.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 35110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |