CA SB1199 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 226, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 226, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3003 of the Penal Code, relating to sex offenders.
Title
Sex offenders: release.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1199 Wilk et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 1199 Wilk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1199 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 1199 Wilk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1199 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 226, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5222.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6108.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4942.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | April 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4628.) (April 10). |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |