CA SB1196 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 339, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 339, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 396 of the Penal Code, relating to price gouging.
Title
Price gouging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1196 Umberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1196 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1196 Umberg et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1196 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1196 Umberg et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 339, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to unfinished business. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Grove. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5291.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 5). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3875.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3770.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | May 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 396 | Amended Code | Citation Text |