CA SB1192 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 608, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 12.8 (commencing with Section 114379) to Part 7 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to children’s health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children’s meals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1192 Monning Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1192 Monning Senate Third Reading By MCCARTY (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1192 Monning (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 608, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-21SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5565.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 6306.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-07-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 27).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-31AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 4219.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-09SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4746.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code114094Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code114379New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback