CA SB1190 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on September 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-01 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on September 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-01 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 30315, 30321, 30322, and 30324 of, and to add Section 30327.2 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to the California Coastal Commission.
Title
California Coastal Commission: ex parte communications: staff communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1190 Jackson Senate Third Reading By O'DONNELL (Y: 15 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1190 Jackson Senate Third Reading By A.,E.,S.,T.,& I.M. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1190 Jackson (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1190 Jackson Senate Third Reading By A.,E.,S.,T.,& I.M. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1190 Jackson (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-01 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 48. Page 6585.) |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (August 29). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | August 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5974.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E. & R. |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3924.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3495.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22441 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8223 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30322 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30324 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30327 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30327.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |