CA SB1187 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1008, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1369, 1370, 1370.1, 1375.5, and 4019 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Competence to stand trial.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1187 Beall Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1187 Beall Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1187 Beall (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1008, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5864.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 6582.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 15).
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4409.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4305.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-16SenateApril 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4418.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1369Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1369.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1370New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1370.01New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1370.02Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1370.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1375.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code4019Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback