CA SB1185 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 41713 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 8385 of, and to add Section 8388.5 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to nonvehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency backup generators: operation during deenergization events.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1185 Moorlach (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-06-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 3.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3622.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-26SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2020-05-22SenateSet for hearing May 29.
2020-05-12SenateReferral to Com. on E., U. & C. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
2020-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2020-03-18SenateApril 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-10SenateSet for hearing April 1.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and E., U. & C.
2020-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code41713New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code8385Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8388.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback