CA SB1170 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7107.5 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: water pollution prevention plans: delegation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1170 Wieckowski (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1170 Wieckowski (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4105.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (May 27). |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | May 16 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3643.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3335.) (March 30). |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E.Q. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 7107.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |