CA SB1169 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Set for hearing May 1.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Set for hearing May 1.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2 of the Los Angeles County Flood Control Act (Chapter 755 of the Statutes of 1915), relating to the Los Angeles County Flood Control District.
Title
Los Angeles County Flood Control District: finances.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |