CA SB1169 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 25 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2104.3 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Violations: penalties and fines: wildfire incidents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-03-28SenateApril 17 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code2104.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback