CA SB1169 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 275, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 275, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2831 of the Fish and Game Code, and to amend Section 1 of Chapter 644 of the Statutes of 2007, relating to wildlife resources.
Title
Natural community conservation planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1169 Kehoe Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-13 - Assembly - SB 1169 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By ATKINS (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1169 Kehoe (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-13 - Assembly - SB 1169 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By ATKINS (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1169 Kehoe (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 275, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-21 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4634.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-14 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-13 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5896.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-09 | Read third time and amended. (Page 5841.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-28 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). | |
2012-06-11 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2012-04-12 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-04-12 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3128.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-04-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-29 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-03-28 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3022.) (March 27). | |
2012-03-20 | Set for hearing March 27. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2831 | Amended Code | Citation Text |