CA SB1167 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - April 17 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3660.)
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - April 17 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3660.)
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42270 of, and to add Section 42271.5 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: single-use drinking vessels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3660.) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42271.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |