CA SB1158 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15403 and 15404 of the Probate Code, relating to trusts.
Title
Trusts: modification or termination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1158 Anderson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3849.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (May 3). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 15403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 15404 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 15406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |