CA SB1155 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: Los Angeles County Community Colleges Common Course Numbering Pilot Project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1155 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1155 |