CA SB115 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2019 (Chapters 23 and 55 of the Statutes of 2019) by amending Item 0250-101-0001 of that act, and to amend the Budget Act of 2020 (Chapters 6 and 7 of the Statutes of 2020) by amending Items 0250-301-0660, 0650-001-0001, 0690-490, 0820-001-0001, 0820-001-0460, 1111-001-3252, 1701-001-0240, 1701-001-0299, 1701-001-3363, 2240-103-6069, 2240-495, 2740-001-0044, 3360-001-3117, 3360-101-3211, 3540-494, 3600-001-6088, 3600-101-6083, 3600-491, 3600-492, 3640-001-0447, 3760-492, 3790-101-6088, 3790-493, 3825-101-6088, 3840-001-0890, 3860-001-6083, 3860-101-6083, 3860-301-6083, 3900-492, 3940-495, 4170-001-0001, 4300-301-0001, 4560-001-3085, 4560-101-3085, 5180-101-0001, 5180-111-0001, 5180-151-0001, 5225-301-0001, 5225-301-0660, 5225-495, 6100-001-0001, 6100-001-0890, 6100-112-0890, 6100-113-0890, 6100-125-0890, 6100-134-0890, 6100-136-0890, 6100-137-0890, 6100-156-0890, 6100-161-0001, 6100-166-0890, 6100-194-0001, 6100-194-0890, 6100-195-0890, 6100-196-0001, 6100-197-0890, 6100-294-0890, 6100-488, 6120-212-0001, 6870-301-6087, 7300-001-3078, 7350-001-0223, 7350-001-3121, 7350-001-3152, 7600-001-0001, 7730-001-0001, 8570-101-0001, 8955-301-0660, and 9210-110-0001 of, adding Items 0521-491, 0540-101-6083, 0540-601-6088, 0559-002-0001, 3540-101-0005, 3860-101-6031, 3940-012-0439, 3940-101-6013, 3940-101-6019, 3940-101-6029, 3940-101-6031, 4180-001-0001, 4700-101-0001, 6440-301-0658, 6440-301-0705, 6440-301-0791, 6440-301-6028, 6440-301-6041, 6440-301-6048, and 7600-011-0001 to, and repealing Item 4260-101-3366 of, Section 2.00 of, and amending Sections 39.00 and 99.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2019: Budget Act of 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 115 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB115 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB115 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-09 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 7.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-31AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-31AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended.
2020-08-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-08-24AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 676.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14199.60New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback