CA SB1149 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Stone.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Stone.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.8 (commencing with Section 1002.9) to Title 14 of Part 2 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions: agreements settling actions involving public health or safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1149 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Stone (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1149 Leyva et al (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1149 Leyva et al (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Stone. |
2022-08-29 | Read third time. Refused passage. | |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 14). |
2022-06-07 | Assembly | June 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 3841.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3326.) (April 5). |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1002.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |