CA SB1147 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 24011 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: counties: consolidation of offices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 24011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |