CA SB1144 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4775 of the Civil Code, and to add Section 50034 to the Government Code, relating to drought relief.
Title
Common interest developments: local governments: yard maintenance fines: drought.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 4775 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50034 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1144&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1144_bill_20140220_introduced.html |