CA SB1143 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1798.90.51, 1798.90.52, and 1798.90.53 of, and to add Section 1798.90.56 to, the Civil Code, relating to personal information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automated license plate recognition systems: use of data.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1798.90.51Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.90.52Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.90.53Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.90.56New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback