CA SB1141 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 751, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 751, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1095 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance.
Title
Unemployment insurance: use of information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1141 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1141 Hancock Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Special Consent #12 SB1141 Hancock (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1141 Hancock Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Special Consent #12 SB1141 Hancock (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 751, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4943.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6539.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6339.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3242.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2977.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |