CA SB1135 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 558, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 558, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 3440) to Title 2 of Part 3 of the Penal Code, relating to inmates.
Title
Inmates: sterilization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1135 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1135 Jackson Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1135 Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1135 Jackson Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1135 Jackson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 558, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4604.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6129.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3604.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3710.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Corrected March 26.) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3440 | New Code | See Bill Text |