CA SB113 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 8654.2 and 16429.7 to the Government Code, to add Section 116773.5 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 6902.5, 12209, 17039, 17039.3, 17052.10, 17276.23, 19900, 19902, 23036.3, and 24416.23 of, to add Sections 17158.2, 17158.3, 24308.2, and 24308.3 to, and to add and repeal Sections 17131.16, 17131.17, 24308.4, and 24308.5 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to economic relief, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Economic relief: COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Assembly - SB 113 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB113 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB113 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB113 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB113 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-02-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-02-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2878.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3495.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 3480.) |
2022-02-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 272.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |