CA SB113 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 668, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65585 and 65589.11 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 50515.02 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB113 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - SB 113 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB113 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 668, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-09-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2924.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-12SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3465.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2019-09-12AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-12AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-09-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2019-09-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-08-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 675.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65585Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65589.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50515.02Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback