CA SB113 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2017 by amending Items 0250-001-3037, 0250-001-3066, 0845-001-0217, 1111-011-0001, 2660-302-0042, 2740-001-0044, 3360-001-0465, 3790-493, 4260-001-0001, 5225-002-0001, 6100-001-0890, 6100-105-0001, 6100-113-0001, 6100-113-0890, 6100-119-0890, 6100-134-0890, 6100-149-0001, 6100-156-0001, 6100-156-0890, 6100-194-0001, 6100-194-0890, 6100-197-0890, 6100-403, 6870-301-6087, 6870-403, and 9100-101-0001 of, and adding Item 6100-495 to, Section 2.00 of, and amending Sections 3.60, 31.00, and 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB113 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 113 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB113 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 113 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB113 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-08-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2222.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2748.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 2746.) |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 10.) (August 23). |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1039.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |