CA SB1127 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 49414.1 to the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
An act to add Section 49414.1 to the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1127 Hill Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 42 N: 29 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1127 Hill Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1127 Hill et al (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1127 Hill Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1127 Hill et al (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 29. Page 6601.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Mullin. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 39. Noes 24. Page 6515.) |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 3). |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 4228.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4997.) (May 8). |
2018-04-30 | Senate | (Corrected April 30). |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4533.) (April 4). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | March 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49414.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |