CA SB1126 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 4 (commencing with Section 19600) to Division 9 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to wildlife.
Title
The Wildlife Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-27 | Set for hearing April 17. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and N.R. & W. | |
2012-02-21 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2012-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 19600 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1126&sess=1112&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1126_bill_20120217_introduced.html |