CA SB1125 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 46148 of, to add Section 8203.4 to, and to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 36000) to Part 21 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to local educational agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local educational agencies: educational programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-12SenateReferral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
2020-03-18SenateApril 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-06SenateSet for hearing April 1.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
2020-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code46148Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8203.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback