CA SB1124 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 116362 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Public health goal: primary drinking water standard: manganese.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1124 Archuleta (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1124 Archuleta (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 3921.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3784.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3239.) (March 28). |
2022-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q., N.R. & W., and GOV. & F. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116362 | New Code | See Bill Text |