CA SB1124 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 321, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 321, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Chapter 377 of the Statutes of 2004, relating to land conservation.
Title
Land conservation: California Wildlife, Coastal, and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1124 Negrete McLeod (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1124 Negrete McLeod Senate Third Reading By CARTER (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1124 Negrete McLeod (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1124 Negrete McLeod Reconsider (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1124 Negrete McLeod (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1124 Negrete McLeod Senate Third Reading By CARTER (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1124 Negrete McLeod (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1124 Negrete McLeod Reconsider (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1124 Negrete McLeod (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 321, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-25 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4910.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-23 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6494.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 6427.) To third reading. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.) | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-06-10 | To Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-06-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 3775.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-28 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 22. Noes 6. Page 3649.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Negrete McLeod. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 3649.) | |
2010-05-10 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-05-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |
2010-04-27 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-26 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2010-04-13 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3163.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-04-01 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2010-03-18 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-10 | Set for hearing March 23. | |
2010-02-25 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-02-19 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |