CA SB1120 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 302, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 302, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6738, 6787, 8729, and 8792 of, to add Sections 6767, 7856, and 8753 to, and to repeal Section 6795.1 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 8813.1 of the Public Resources Code, relating to engineering, land surveying, and geology.
Title
Engineering, land surveying, and geology.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1120 Jones Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SB 1120 Jones Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1120 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SB 1120 Jones Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1120 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 302, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4828.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5756.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3647.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3436.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3167.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., JUD., and GOV. & F. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6738 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6767 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6787 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6795.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7856 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8729 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8753 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8792 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 8813.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |