CA SB112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23320 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 12815, 16418.8, 19822.3, 20397, and 100002 of, and to repeal Section 100006 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 11495 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 1019.2 of, and to add Section 1019.4 to, the Labor Code, to amend Sections 6126, 6126.2, 6126.3, 6126.5, and 6133 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 27150.2, 27151, and 40610 of the Vehicle Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB112 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - SB 112 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB112 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - SB 112 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB112 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 364, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2923.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 3464.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 675.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100006 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12815 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16418.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19822.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20397 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11495 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1019.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1019.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 6126 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6126.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6126.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6126.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6133 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 27150.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 27151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |