CA SB112 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19859 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 179.9, 3557, 7310, and 15820.948 of, and to add Section 31680.15 to, the Government Code, to add Section 13143.7 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 4032 of, and to add Section 29581 to, the Penal Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB112 B.&F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 112 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB112 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 112 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB112 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2960.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Unanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 20. Page 3471.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3470.) |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 9.) (September 14). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | September 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 2825.) |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1039.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19859 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14527 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15820.948 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 179.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31680.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 3557 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13143.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 29581 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 4032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 75225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2033 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2034 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2192 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2396 | Amended Code | Citation Text |