CA SB112 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17557 and 17558 of the Government Code, relating to state mandates.
Title
State mandates: claiming instructions.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-07-14 - Assembly - SB 112 Liu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB112 Liu (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB112 Liu (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-08-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2011-07-14 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-07-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2342.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-15 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-05-09 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-04-13 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 558.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-15 | Set for hearing April 6. | |
2011-03-07 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-01-19 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 17557 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 17558 | Amended Code | Citation Text |