CA SB1113 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 354, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 354, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5845 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health in the workplace: voluntary standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1113 Monning et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1113 Monning Senate Third Reading By CARRILLO (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1113 Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1113 Monning Senate Third Reading By CARRILLO (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1113 Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 354, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5548.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6403.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4834.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4769.) (April 23). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4556.) (April 4). |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5845 | Amended Code | Citation Text |