CA SB1113 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 6 (commencing with Section 5920) to Division 5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: mental health.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1113 Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1113 Beall Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1113 Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1113 Beall Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1113 Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-28 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5430.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5914.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4043.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4003.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3645.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3417.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 56601.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1374.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14707.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5846.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5920 | New Code | See Bill Text |