CA SB1111 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 207.1, 207.2, 209, 210.2, and 707.1 of, to repeal Section 207.6 of, and to repeal and add Section 208.5 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: detention facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1111 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Kamlager (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1111 Durazo (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1111 Durazo (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 6. Page 5418.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 3883.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3769.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3569.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 207.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 207.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 207.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 208.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 210.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 707.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |