CA SB1107 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 85300 of, and to add Section 89519.5 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1107 Allen Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1107 Allen Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1107 Allen (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1107 Allen Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1107 Allen (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5579.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 6493.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 15). |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4043.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4003.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3608.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 85206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 85320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 89519.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 91004.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |