CA SB1104 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 848, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 49381 to the Education Code, relating to pupil safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil safety: human trafficking prevention resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1104 Roth et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1104 Roth Senate Third Reading By O'DONNELL (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1104 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 848, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5861.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6592.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4453.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4303.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-23SenateApril 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4533.) (April 4).
2018-03-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-12SenateMarch 21 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-05SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49381New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback