CA SB1103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on L. & E.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 14050) to Chapter 3 of Division 7 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to job training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workforce training programs: supportive services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1103 Hurtado (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-06-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateHearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (May 14).
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-05-11SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2020-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 14 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt.
2020-03-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Unemployment Insurance Code14050New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback