CA SB1103 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - April 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4818.)
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - April 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4818.)
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11372 of, and to add Section 11370.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: fentanyl.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - [04-10-2018] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - [04-10-2018] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | April 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4818.) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | April 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 4628.) Reconsideration granted. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11370.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11370.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11372 | Amended Code | Citation Text |