CA SB1102 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2810.5 of, and to add Section 2810.6 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employers: Labor Commissioner: required disclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1102 Monning (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-06-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-12SenateReferral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
2020-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2020-05-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-04-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-03-26SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-03-18SenateMarch 25 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-11SenateSet for hearing March 25.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
2020-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code2810.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code2810.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback