CA SB110 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 4.4 (commencing with Section 30964.10) of Division 17 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
East Span, San Francisco-Oakland Bay Bridge Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB110 DeSaulnier Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-22 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Assembly - SB 110 DeSaulnier Third Reading Urgency By AMMIANO (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB110 Steinberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-22 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Assembly - SB 110 DeSaulnier Third Reading Urgency By AMMIANO (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB110 Steinberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2013-10-11 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-11 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:05 p.m. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1974.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Set for hearing August 22. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1957.) |
2013-08-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1921.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2606.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and TRANS. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and A. & A.R. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 608.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 534.) (April 15). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 391.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-01-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14521.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 30964.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |