CA SB11 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-11 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-11 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44060.5, 44125, 44271, 44275, 44280, 44281, 44282, 44283, 44287, 44299.1, and 44299.2 of, and to repeal Section 44299 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 9250.1, 9261.1, and 9853.6 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicular air pollution, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Alternative fuel and vehicle technologies: funding programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 11 Pavley Third Reading Urgency By PEREA Amend By PEREA Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB11 Pavley Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB11 Pavley Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3147.) |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2950.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 30). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1184.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1005.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 487.) (April 9). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 405.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and T. & H. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected December 4.) |