CA SB11 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 326, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 326, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 8.10 (commencing with Section 31699.1) to Chapter 3 of Part 3 of Division 4 of Title 3 of the Government Code, relating to county employees retirement.
Title
County employees retirement: San Bernardino County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-20 - Assembly - SB 11 Negrete McLeod Senate Third Reading By EMMERSON (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB11 Negrete McLeod (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB11 Negrete McLeod (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 326, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-10 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2009-09-08 | Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2009-08-27 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m. | |
2009-08-24 | In Senate. To enrollment. (Enrolled measure version corrected August 25.) | |
2009-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 2668.) To Senate. | |
2009-07-09 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |
2009-06-25 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-05-14 | To Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |
2009-05-06 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-06 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 792.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-21 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 557.) | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2009-01-29 | To Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2008-12-02 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |