CA SB1099 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6731.1 and 8726 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions.
Title
Land surveyors and civil engineers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6731.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8725 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 8726 | Amended Code | Citation Text |